MA S1332 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to out-of-hospital birth access and safety. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to out-of-hospital birth access and safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-12-30SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-05-20JointHearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S134 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1706 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
S165 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H244 (Similar To) 2019-05-07 - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S1222 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H1864
H889 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1979 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H3873 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2298 (Similar To) 2019-08-28 - Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback