MA S1330 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-6)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-27 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to support access, value and equity in health care. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To support access, value and equity in health care

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-27HouseHouse concurred
2020-02-10HouseHouse concurred
2020-02-06SenateReporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-09-13JointHearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S599 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S687 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S559 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S719 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S718 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1151 (Similar To) 2019-09-10 - Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S674 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
H1192 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback