MA S1325 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to taxes due upon the death of active duty personnel. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to taxes due upon the death of active duty personnel

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-01-06SenateNo further action taken
2013-09-12SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2013-06-11JointHearing scheduled for 06/11/2013 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2013-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2013-01-22SenateReferred to the Senate Committee on Revenue

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback