MA S1298 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Mental Health, Substance Abuse and Recovery Committee
Hearing: Oct 25 @ 1:00 pm in Virtual Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to inform prescribers of non-opioid alternative care. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To inform prescribers of non-opioid alternative care

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-22JointHearing scheduled for 10/25/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery

Same As/Similar To

H2092 (Similar To) 2021-09-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H226 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Senate concurred
H2097 (Similar To) 2021-09-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2093 (Similar To) 2021-09-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1451 (Similar To) 2021-05-21 - Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback