MA S1292 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2547
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase access to health care in underserved areas of Massachusetts. Public Health.
Title
To increase access to health care in underserved areas of Massachusetts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2547 |
2019-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H729 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S222 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
S324 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H79 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Placed on file
H2478 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H1914 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S561 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S687 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S838 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
S670 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2447 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2547 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S222 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
S324 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H79 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Placed on file
H2478 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H1914 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S561 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S687 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S838 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
S670 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2447 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2547 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1292 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1292.pdf |