MA S1288 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize the County Commissioners of Dukes County to appoint a treasurer who may not be a resident of the county. Municipalities and Regional Government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the County Commissioners of Dukes County to appoint a treasurer who may not be a resident of the county

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-21 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2024
2024-02-12SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2024-02-12HouseEnacted
2024-02-08HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2024-01-11HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2024-01-11HouseRules suspended
2024-01-11HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2024-01-10HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2024-01-08SenateRead second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2024-01-08SenateRules suspended
2024-01-08SenateCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2023-07-03SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
2023-04-04JointHearing scheduled for 04/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H3893 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback