MA S1260 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - House concurred
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - House concurred
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the definition of podiatry. Public Health.
Title
Relative to the definition of podiatry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | House | House concurred |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2017-10-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/07/2017 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S916 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S140 (Similar To) 2017-09-20 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S567 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S637 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1916 (Similar To) 2017-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1009 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H745 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H1337 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H650 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H2450 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - House concurred
H932 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S140 (Similar To) 2017-09-20 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S567 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S637 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1916 (Similar To) 2017-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1009 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H745 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H1337 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H650 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H2450 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - House concurred
H932 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1260 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1260.pdf |