MA S1233 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-5)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to update postural screenings in schools. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To update postural screenings in schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-04SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-10-11JointHearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S731 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S272 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H557 (Similar To) 2019-06-28 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-2
H524 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H437 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1113 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2711
S306 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S307 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S314 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S330 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2351 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3853 (Similar To) 2019-09-27 - Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback