MA S123 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide consumers with equal protection for all real estate appraisals. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing consumers with equal protection for all real estate appraisals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-27SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2019-05-07JointHearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H2956 (Similar To) 2020-01-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
H3069 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1423 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H2133 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2091 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2108 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
S2065 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-01-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
H332 (Similar To) 2019-06-28 - Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S1434 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1424 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H3032 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S2262 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2353
S2286 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2354
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2354 (Similar To) 2019-10-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 96 of the Acts of 2019
S2353 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 14 of the Acts of 2020
H3137 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S1936 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H3036 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied H3141
H3017 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2381 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2020
S2409 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback