MA S1225 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to update overtime protections to protect the Commonwealth's middle class workers. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Updating overtime protections to protect the Commonwealth's middle class workers
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Rep. Erika Uyterhoeven [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] |
Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] | Sen. Joanne Comerford [D] | Rep. Maria Robinson [D] | Sen. Adam Hinds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied by H1960 |
2021-10-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:30 AM-04:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1960 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied S1225
S1184 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1195 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1193 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1074 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied H1513
S1521 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1130 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1184 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1195 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1193 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1074 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied H1513
S1521 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1130 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1225 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1225.pdf |