MA S1216 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S3023
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a Commission on Unemployment Trust Fund Solvency. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
To establish a Commission on Unemployment Trust Fund Solvency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-21 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S3023 |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday July 15, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-04-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 13, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/18/2021 from 10:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1271 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
S573 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4603
S2076 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
H4016 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2021
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
H2034 (Similar To) 2022-07-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3023
S2536 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S428 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S2113 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
H2583 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2584 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H3725 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
S16 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
H2587 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2588 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S2051 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied H3121
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S994 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1907
S82 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Recommitted to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S295 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S3023 (Replaced by) 2022-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2727 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S573 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4603
S2076 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
H4016 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2021
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
H2034 (Similar To) 2022-07-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3023
S2536 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S428 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S2113 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
H2583 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2584 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H3725 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
S16 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
H2587 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2588 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S2051 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied H3121
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S994 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1907
S82 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Recommitted to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S295 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S3023 (Replaced by) 2022-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2727 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1216 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1216.pdf |