MA S1209 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to remove obstacles and expand abortion access. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To remove obstacles and expand abortion access

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseHouse concurred
2020-02-10SenateReporting date extended to Tuesday May 12, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-06-07JointHearing scheduled for 06/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-06-05HouseHouse concurred
2019-06-03SenateDischarged to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H1985 (Similar To) 2019-08-28 - Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H726 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2954 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Hearing scheduled for 01/02/2020 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1
H633 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H1002 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S151 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4298
H3432 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H1914 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H864 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Hearing rescheduled to 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222
H3320 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Senate concurred
S952 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - House concurred
S2278 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - New draft substituted, see S2296
S2296 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback