MA S1205 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to prohibiting the dispensing of food in disposable food service containers made from polystyrene or from expanded polystyrene. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To restrict the use of polystyrene

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-18SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2020-02-10HouseHouse concurred
2020-02-06SenateReporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-06-04JointHearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H3299 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H881 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Hearing rescheduled to 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222
S1200 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2524
H1746 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
S66 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2482
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1178 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H828 (Similar To) 2019-07-09 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S937 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - House concurred
H735 (Similar To) 2019-03-26 - Hearing scheduled for 04/02/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S918 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2220 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H3886 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4084 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2450

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback