MA S1202 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2344
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-31 - New draft substituted, see S2344
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-31 - New draft substituted, see S2344
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide the next of kin of a state police officer killed in the line of duty with a flag during the memorial service. Public Service.
Title
Relative to providing the next of kin of a state police officer killed in the line of duty with a flag during the memorial service.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Brewer [D] | Rep. Sean Garballey [D] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] |
Rep. Denise Andrews [D] | Rep. Todd Smola [R] | Sen. Michael Knapik [R] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-31 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2344 |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Read second |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Committee recommended that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2013-06-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in 437 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2344 (Replaced by) 2014-08-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1202 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1202.pdf |