MA S1201 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2816

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2816
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to emergency unemployment insurance for gig economy workers. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to emergency unemployment insurance for gig economy workers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-07SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2816
2022-03-17SenateSenate concurred
2022-02-07HouseReporting date extended to Monday April 4, 2022, pending concurrence
2021-05-07JointHearing scheduled for 05/18/2021 from 10:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

H90 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3702
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90
S1202 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1983 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Senate concurred
H2047 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1231 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2047
H2033 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Senate concurred
S1232 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S2816 (Replaced by) 2022-04-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback