MA S1182 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2422
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the safe treatment of pain. Public Health.
Title
Relative to the safe treatment of pain
Sponsors
Sen. Julian Cyr [D] | Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Rep. John Scibak [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2422 |
2017-10-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/07/2017 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1198 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1183 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H566 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H1181 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H3247 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S2422 (Replaced by) 2018-04-19 - Reported (in part) by S1241
S1183 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H566 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H1181 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H3247 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S2422 (Replaced by) 2018-04-19 - Reported (in part) by S1241
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1182 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1182.pdf |