MA S1150 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H1732

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide access to full spectrum addiction treatment services. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing access to full spectrum addiction treatment services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-11SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2020-05-11SenateAccompanied by H1732
2019-08-28JointHearing scheduled for 09/04/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery

Same As/Similar To

H1732 (Replaces) 2020-05-11 - Accompanied by S1150

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback