MA S1144 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Mental Health, Substance Abuse and Recovery Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to mental health peer specialists certification. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to mental health peer specialists certification

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-06HouseHouse concurred
2020-02-05SenateReporting date extended to Friday March 20, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-07-18JointHearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in 222
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery

Same As/Similar To

H729 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S324 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2478 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S1439 (Similar To) 2019-10-16 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1
H1248 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
H1262 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
H560 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Hearing scheduled for 06/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2052 (Similar To) 2019-11-21 - Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S43 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-1
H3524 (Similar To) 2019-09-27 - Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback