MA S1110 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Labor and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the scheduling of employees. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the scheduling of employees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02JointHearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

S1105 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H1602 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S1511 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
S1512 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
H1626 (Similar To) 2019-03-19 - Hearing scheduled for 03/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S1058 (Similar To) 2019-06-11 - Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S1544 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
S1810 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1
H2386 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H638 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S1548 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H2196 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2197 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback