MA S1101 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to protect victims of crimes and the public. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To protect victims of crimes and the public

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-22HouseHouse concurred
2024-05-20SenateReporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-04-16HouseHouse concurred
2024-03-28SenateReporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-09-19JointHearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S1129 (Similar To) 2024-05-22 - House concurred
S962 (Similar To) 2024-05-22 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback