MA S11 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - Placed on file, in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - Placed on file, in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Lewis (by request), a petition of Vincent Lawrence Dixon for a legislative amendment to the Constitution for term renewal process. The Judiciary.
Title
Proposal for a legislative amendment to the Constitution for term renewal process
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-27 | House | Placed on file, in concurrence |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file |
2023-03-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-09 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S2319 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Resolution reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S11 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S11.pdf |