MA S1032 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2496

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the tracking of medical malpractice cases . The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the tracking of medical malpractice cases

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-03SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2496
2019-11-05JointHearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S959 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S888 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H1085 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S911 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H1412 (Similar To) 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S837 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H2085 (Similar To) 2019-10-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2237 (Similar To) 2019-07-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 38 of the Acts of 2019
S2496 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback