MA S1022 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2496

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to habitual drunk drivers. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to habitual drunk drivers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-03SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2496
2019-10-29JointHearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H1432 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S999 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied H3567
S1007 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3280 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S359 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2040 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S1365 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2039 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S445 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1968 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2496 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback