MA S100 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 217 of the Acts of 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 217 of the Acts of 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
(by vote of the town)for legislation to establish a linkage exaction program in the city of Gloucester
Title
(by vote of the town)for legislation to establish a linkage exaction program in the city of Gloucester
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-04 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 217 of the Acts of 2010 | |
2010-07-29 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | |
2010-07-29 | Enacted | |
2010-07-28 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-07-28 | Rules suspended | |
2010-07-27 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2010-07-27 | Rules suspended | |
2010-07-26 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading | |
2010-07-19 | Read; and referred to the House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2010-07-15 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-07-15 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | |
2009-10-20 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2009-10-08 | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | |
2009-01-20 | Public Hearing date 9/29 at 11:00 AM in Gardner Auditorium | |
2009-01-20 | House concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Business |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/s00100.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/senate/186/st00/st00100.htm |