MA H3290 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to raise the maximum storage charge of involuntarily towed, non-commercial motor vehicles. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the maximum storage charges on motor vehicles involuntarily towed

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-17HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
2022-03-24HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2022-01-06JointHearing scheduled for 01/11/2022 from 11:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

S2238 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S657 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2698
S2540 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2357 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2312 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3521 (Similar To) 2021-07-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3488 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Hearing scheduled for 01/25/2022 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2321 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2341 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2861
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S2348 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback