MA H3029 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4443

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4443
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to create a rail transit fund from certain increased assessments and vehicle emissions classifications. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating the Massachusetts rail transit fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-04HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4443
2013-12-02JointHearing scheduled for 12/10/2013 from 12:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
2013-11-18JointHearing scheduled for 11/21/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2013-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2013-01-22HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H4443 (Replaced by) 2014-09-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback