MA H995 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to human donor milk insurance coverage. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to human donor milk coverage

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-02HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-09-30JointHearing scheduled for 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H1110 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
H947 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S613 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H945 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S711 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback