MA H991 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 69-19)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to access to telemedicine services. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Advancing and expanding access to telemedicine services

Sponsors

Rep. Thomas Golden [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]
Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]
Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Rep. William Straus [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]
Rep. Roselee Vincent [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]
Rep. Michael Soter [R]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]
Rep. Rady Mom [D]Rep. Bradley Jones [R]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. David Nangle [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]
Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]
Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]Sen. Dean Tran [R]
Rep. William Crocker [R]Sen. Joseph Boncore [D]Rep. Shawn Dooley [R]Rep. Colleen Garry [D]
Rep. Donald Wong [R]Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]
Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Hannah Kane [R]Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]
Rep. Steven Howitt [R]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Randy Hunt [R]Rep. Russell Holmes [D]
Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]
Rep. Shaunna O'Connell [R]Rep. David Muradian [R]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Josh Cutler [D]
Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Daniel Carey [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]
Rep. Jonathan Zlotnik [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]
Rep. Alice Peisch [D]Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]
Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [R]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. Michael Moran [D]
Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Claire Cronin [D]Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]
Rep. David Biele [D]Rep. David Vieira [R]Rep. Brian Murray [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]
Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [R]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Monday May 4, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-09-18JointHearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H1002 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H637 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H1095 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H1705 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1492 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback