MA H986 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to telehealth and digital equity for patients. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to telehealth and digital equity for patients
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-04-28 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 05/02/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-04-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A2 and virtual |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S655 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H4274 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H4293 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4426 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2637 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H4274 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H4293 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4426 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2637 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H986 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H986.pdf |