MA H976 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-28 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-28 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to insurance coverage for craniofacial disorders. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to insurance coverage for craniofacial disorders
Sponsors
Rep. John Scibak [D] | Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R] | Rep. Louis Kafka [D] | Rep. Peter Kocot [D] |
Rep. Timothy Madden [D] | Sen. James Timilty [D] | Sen. Richard Ross [R] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-28 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-07-21 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Health Care Financing |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-05-15 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday July 31, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-10-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H976 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H976.pdf |