MA H975 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-10)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to payment for ambulance services provided to certain insured individuals. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to ambulance service reimbursement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21SenateSenate concurred
2020-05-04HouseReporting date extended to Monday June 15, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Monday May 4, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-05-01JointHearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H1563 (Similar To) 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S1416 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222
S1356 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
H2838 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S655 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Senate concurred
H929 (Similar To) 2019-09-30 - Hearing scheduled for 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H2968 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H2365 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback