MA H974 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-22 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-22 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide insurance coverage for magnetic resonance imaging for certain persons for the detection of breast cancer. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to providing insurance coverage for breast cancer screening
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-05-15 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday July 31, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-02-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/05/2014 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H974 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H974.pdf |