MA H973 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4643

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-18)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4643
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to motor vehicle insurance quotes. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to fair and accurate motor vehicle insurance quotes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-16HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4643
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Monday May 4, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-09-13JointHearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H901 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
H903 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
H1115 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
H1116 (Similar To) 2019-11-13 - Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
H1050 (Similar To) 2019-11-13 - Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
H2956 (Similar To) 2020-01-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
H2394 (Similar To) 2019-07-17 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H2668 (Similar To) 2019-07-18 - Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S637 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S597 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H359 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S623 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H2245 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H1006 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3746 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S697 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
H2189 (Similar To) 2019-07-21 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2
H4210 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2019
S2416 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H4643 (Replaced by) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback