MA H947 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4039
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4039
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4039
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a foreclosure mediation program within the Office of Public Collaboration at the University of Massachusetts at Boston to offer alternative to forclosures. Financial Services.
Title
To facilitate alternatives to foreclosure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4039 |
2014-02-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/26/2014 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H4039 (Replaced by) 2014-04-15 - Reported, in part, by H2861
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H947 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H947.pdf |