MA H945 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide insurance coverage for the use of electronic tracking devices to protect the safety of persons with Autism spectrum disorder or Alzheimer’s disease. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the safety of autistic and alzheimer individuals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-02HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-06-26JointHearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H987 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
H2397 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H598 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
H1115 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
S613 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S697 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
H1110 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
H947 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback