MA H943 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 29, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 29, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to state and local fees assessed to transportation for hire companies. Financial Services.
Title
Establishing a commission to examine transportation fees
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Cusack [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 29, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-05-04 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 4, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-07-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S1861 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
S2221 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H4020 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 49 of the Acts of 2019
S2309 (Similar To) 2019-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4070 (Similar To) 2020-10-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5032
H2060 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H190 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H2245 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1455 (Similar To) 2020-05-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2437 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2020
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
S2221 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H4020 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 49 of the Acts of 2019
S2309 (Similar To) 2019-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4070 (Similar To) 2020-10-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5032
H2060 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H190 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H2245 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1455 (Similar To) 2020-05-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2437 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H943 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H943.pdf |