MA H94 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to revoke the acceptance of a certain General Law establishing a board of election commissioners in the town of Longmeadow. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Revoking the town of Longmeadow’s acceptance of a certain general law establishing a board of election commissioners
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Sen. Eric Lesser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2021 | |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2021-08-16 | House | Enacted |
2021-08-12 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-08-12 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2021-07-29 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2021-07-26 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-07-19 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-07-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-07-19 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2021-07-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H94 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H94.pdf |