MA H927 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-16 - Senate concurred
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-16 - Senate concurred
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to HIV-associated lipodystrophy treatment. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to HIV-associated lipodystrophy treatment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-05-12 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-03-09 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2015-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2015 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H3299 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3300 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2648 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2031 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Senate concurred
H2030 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H3300 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2648 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2031 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Senate concurred
H2030 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H927 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H927.pdf |