MA H926 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to pesticide products eligible for use on the outdoor grounds of schools, child care centers or school age child care programs. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to improving pesticide protections for Massachusetts schoolchildren
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-05-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-03-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-12-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H896 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H3607 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4478
H566 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5143
S2371 (Similar To) 2022-02-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2640
H3607 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4478
H566 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5143
S2371 (Similar To) 2022-02-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2640
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H926 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H926.pdf |