MA H923 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to ensuring equal accommodations for sexes in Department of Conservation and Recreation owned facilities. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
Relative to Department of Conservation and Recreation facility Title IX compliance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-31 | Senate | No further action taken |
2024-07-15 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2024-07-11 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-04-18 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-04-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-04-18 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-03-21 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-09-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
H96 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4387
H831 (Similar To) 2024-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
S358 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2614
H4182 (Similar To) 2024-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
S569 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
H831 (Similar To) 2024-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
S358 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2614
H4182 (Similar To) 2024-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
S569 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H923 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H923.pdf |