MA H908 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5236
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5236
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5236
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to recreation on private tidelands. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to recreation on private tidelands
Sponsors
Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D] | Rep. David Rogers [D] | Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Rep. Mike Connolly [D] |
Rep. Danillo Sena [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Rep. Tram Nguyen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5236 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 12, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-12-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S511 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2878
H1007 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2880
H1010 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H3232 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H848 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S2490 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
H4010 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 70 of the Acts of 2021
H850 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S2418 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S594 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S598 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S599 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S560 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S262 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2891
S521 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
H5236 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1007 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2880
H1010 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H3232 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H848 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S2490 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
H4010 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 70 of the Acts of 2021
H850 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S2418 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S594 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S598 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S599 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S560 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S262 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2891
S521 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
H5236 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H908 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H908.pdf |