MA H897 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4415

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4415
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to forest protection. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to forest protection

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4415
2019-09-12JointHearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S485 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S576 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
S1670 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H2585 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H1829 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S2316 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2352 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
S1850 (Similar To) 2019-08-08 - Accompanied H2793
H4415 (Replaced by) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback