MA H875 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5072
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5072
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5072
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to testing for soil used as fill material for certain reclamation projects. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Regarding soil reclamation safety oversight
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Soter [R] | Sen. Ryan Fattman [R] | Rep. Shawn Dooley [R] | Rep. Joseph McKenna [R] |
Rep. Alyson Sullivan-Almeida [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5072 |
2019-07-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H5072 (Replaced by) 2020-10-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H875 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H875.pdf |