MA H859 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Hearing scheduled for 05/18/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to certain provisions of the agricultural preservation restriction program. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To modernize certain provisions of the agricultural preservation restriction program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-11JointHearing scheduled for 05/18/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S2014 (Similar To) 2021-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/20/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3261 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3818 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Senate concurred
S491 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Hearing scheduled for 05/19/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback