MA H857 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4111
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to written estimates of the cost of certain motor vehicle body repairs. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to protecting consumers by providing notice
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4111 |
2015-11-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/01/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in TBD |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H4111 (Replaced by) 2016-04-04 - Reported, in part, by H948
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H857 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H857.pdf |