MA H85 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the installation of internet services for abutting owners on private ways. Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity.
Title
Internet access on private ways
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-03-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-03-14 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-02-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-07-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-07-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-07-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity |
Same As/Similar To
H3304 (Similar To) 2023-10-23 - Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H3313 (Similar To) 2023-10-23 - Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H3313 (Similar To) 2023-10-23 - Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H85 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H85.pdf |