MA H846 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Accompanied S535
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Accompanied S535
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative LaNatra of Kingston, a petition of Kathleen R. LaNatra and others that the Department of Environmental Protection provide grants to small businesses to encourage keeping material, products, and services in circulation for as long as possible. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
Relative to a future blue economy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Accompanied S535 |
2023-04-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
S535 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H846 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H846.pdf |