MA H843 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-19 - Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to municipal elections. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ensuring municipal power over whether elections are reformed

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-19JointHearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

H802 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Senate concurred
S148 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - House concurred
H431 (Similar To) 2021-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H432 (Similar To) 2021-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H4141 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Senate concurred
S1611 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2930 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Senate concurred
H3100 (Similar To) 2021-06-30 - Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback