MA H833 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the uses of the land owned by the Commercial Wharf East Condominium and its condominium unit owners in the city of Boston under the tidelands law. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Confirming Commercial Wharf East Condominium Association present uses as authorized by the Downtown Waterfront-Faneuil Hall Urban Renewal Plan and Chapter 663 of the Acts of 1964 and Chapter 310 of the Acts of 1972 and preventing residents from being forced to sell their property and leave

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-10-17JointHearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

H864 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Hearing rescheduled to 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222
H863 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Hearing rescheduled to 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222
H741 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S1483 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2767 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H3696 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3748 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H3859 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3860 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2320 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S2385 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback