MA H826 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 66-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Hearing scheduled for 06/04/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to environmental equity in the location of power plants, highways, and airports. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to environmental justice in the Commonwealth

Sponsors

Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Sen. Joseph Boncore [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]
Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]
Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]
Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Christopher Markey [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]
Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]
Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]
Rep. Roselee Vincent [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]
Rep. Liz Miranda [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. John Mahoney [D]
Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]
Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [R]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Alan Silvia [D]
Rep. Alice Peisch [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]
Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Rep. Daniel Carey [D]
Rep. William Driscoll [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]
Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Rep. William Galvin [D]
Rep. Bradford Hill [R]Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]Rep. Frank Moran [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]
Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Harold Naughton [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]Sen. Michael Brady [D]
Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. Chynah Tyler [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22JointHearing scheduled for 06/04/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

H2795 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1
H761 (Similar To) 2019-05-22 - Hearing scheduled for 06/04/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S453 (Similar To) 2019-05-22 - Hearing scheduled for 06/04/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S464 (Similar To) 2019-05-22 - Hearing scheduled for 06/04/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback